PORTER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 261194
Charity reporting is up to date (70 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 April 2021 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 October 2020 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 October 2019 238 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 01 October 2019 238 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 09 July 2018 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 09 July 2018 154 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 03 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required