PORTER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 261194
Charity reporting is up to date (70 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £5.04k £45.23k £77.47k £21.65k £12.97k
Total expenditure £3.24k £413.30k £396.12k £125.47k £200.48k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A