PORTER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 261194
Charity reporting is up to date (70 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALBERT CASTLE Trustee 26 March 2002 None on record
JOHN ROBERT PORTER Trustee 18 February 2005
THE JOHN PORTER CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Dame Shirley Porter Trustee 01 April 1970 None on record
Professor Sir Walter Fred Bodmer Trustee 12 March 2006
HUGO (LONDON) Received: On time
THE UNIVERSITY OF HAIFA UK Received: On time
ACADEMIC STUDY GROUP ON ISRAEL AND THE MIDDLE EAST Recently registered
THE FOULKES FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE CHALLENGE FUND - THE FIGHT AGAINST CANCER IN THE EMERGING WORLD Received: On time
FISHER MEMORIAL TRUST Received: On time
Linda Streit Trustee 01 April 1970
THE INTERNATIONAL SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE DANIEL HOWARD TRUST Received: On time
STEVEN NIGEL PORTER Trustee 06 September 1994 None on record