THE SWAY WELFARE AID GROUP

Charity number: 261220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 18 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 13 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 14 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 14 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 09 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 11 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 11 November 2016 On time Download