OXFORD AND DISTRICT MENCAP

Charity number: 261236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 13 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 13 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 21 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 21 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 05 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 05 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 13 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 13 July 2017 On time Download