OXFORD AND DISTRICT MENCAP

Charity number: 261236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £56.08k £57.48k £90.03k £69.62k £41.93k
Total expenditure £58.42k £59.56k £50.33k £58.46k £46.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A