Accounts and annual returns THE LONDON FREE LEGAL ADVICE SOCIETY

Charity number: 261310
Charity reporting is overdue by 119 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 119 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 119 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required