HASTINGS MUSICAL FESTIVAL LIMITED

Charity number: 261351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Richard Wray Trustee 20 December 2017
HASTINGS INTERNATIONAL PIANO Recently registered
PAULINE ELLEN ASH Trustee None on record
Charlotte Beale Trustee 25 October 2019 None on record
Emily Segal Trustee 26 January 2018 None on record
Brenda Bailey Trustee 09 October 2015 None on record
David Nathan Kowitz Trustee 26 January 2018
THE FAIRLIGHT ARTS TRUST Received: On time
KOWITZ FAMILY FOUNDATION (UK) LIMITED Received: On time
SARAH HELENA KOWITZ Trustee 20 December 2017
THE FAIRLIGHT ARTS TRUST Received: On time
KOWITZ FAMILY FOUNDATION (UK) LIMITED Received: On time
THE RYE ART GALLERY TRUST Received: On time
Hastings Contemporary Received: On time
ROLAND GARRAD BSC Trustee None on record
Lesley Moore Trustee 26 September 2014 None on record