G M MORRISON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 261380
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 22 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 20 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 20 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 19 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 05 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 05 December 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)