GIBRALTAR NAVAL TRUST

Charity number: 261420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £1.92m £133.70k £161.10k £163.16k £119.24k
Total expenditure £139.91k £119.99k £112.50k £115.87k £132.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £360 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £928 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £115.72k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £7.10k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £1.80m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £137.57k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.27k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £45.30k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £1.27k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A