Financial history ROYAL ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 261421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £34.16k £31.99k £35.21k £15.34k £2.72k
Total expenditure £42.15k £32.46k £38.73k £22.59k £1.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A