Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF NORTHAMPTON BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 261475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 10 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 17 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required