Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF NORTHAMPTON BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 261475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £21.52k £20.12k £16.61k £26.54k £23.93k
Total expenditure £22.15k £22.02k £17.64k £27.53k £19.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A