THE ATLANTIC COUNCIL OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 261484
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH DECEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED 14TH DECEMBER 1988, AND 19TH MARCH 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM IN THE A)AIMS OF THE ATLANTIC TREATY ENTERED INTO BY THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ITS SUPPORTING ORGANISATION (NATO)AND THE DUTIES AND RESPONSIBILITIES OF THE SAID GOVERNMENT AND INHABITANTS THERUNDER. B) PROBLEMS ASSOCIATED WITH THE PROMOTION OF CLOSER LINKS BETWEEN THE MEMBERS OF THE ATLANTIC ALLIANCE.
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 24 August 1970 : registered
  • 01 June 1994 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names
  • THE ATLANTIC COUNCIL (Working name)
  • THE BRITISH ATLANTIC COMMITTEE (Previous name)
What the charity did
    No information available
Who the charity helped
    No information available
How the charity helped
    No information available