HADLEIGH (SUFFOLK) ELDERLY PEOPLES WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 261655
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 19 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 06 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 14 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required