THE PATON CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 261676
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAKING DONATIONS TO EXISTING CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND LOCAL CHURCHES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2024
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £19,279
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
Registration history:
- 16 October 1970: Standard registration
- 16 August 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
- PATON CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | 01/05/2023 | 01/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £279 | £1.39k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.15k | £4.38k | £3.97k | £10.14k | £19.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH SEPTEMBER 1970
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window