GLOUCESTER GREYFRIARS HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Charity Number: 261877
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 30 November 1970: Standard registration
- 01 September 1992: Removed (Exempt charity)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- BRIDGEHEAD (GLOUCESTER) HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES MODEL H10 1968 (CHARITABLE) DATED 23RD OCTOBER 1970 AS AMENDED 24TH APRIL 1975 AND 2ND MAY 1975
Charitable objects
TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY, THE BUSINESS OF PROVIDING HOUSING AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS. IN PARTICULAR THE ASSOCIATION SHALL PROVIDE RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR EX-OFFENDERS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.