Accounts and annual returns THE PEWTERERS' SEAHORSE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 261889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 23 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 14 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 28 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 28 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window