Financial history THE PEWTERERS' SEAHORSE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 261889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £240.91k £157.66k £128.58k £182.60k £90.65k
Total expenditure £77.47k £74.10k £175.75k £158.01k £143.80k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A