Trustees THE PEWTERERS' SEAHORSE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 261889
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Buxton | Chair | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
John David Edmund Gallagher | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Charles Harold Williams | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Howard Arthur Caplen | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Sophie Hodgson | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Helen Boyle | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Abigail Targett | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Hughes | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.