FRIENDS OF ST PAULS

Charity number: 261905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £226.03k £116.77k £97.17k £81.17k £74.08k
Total expenditure £176.03k £401.81k £115.74k £94.30k £75.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A