FRIENDS OF ST PAULS

Charity number: 261905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sheila Nicoll Trustee 11 December 2019
ST PAUL'S CATHEDRAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Elizabeth Foy Trustee 05 March 2018 None on record
ROBERT PALMER Trustee 08 July 2015 None on record
Dr PHILLIP RICE Trustee 02 July 2014
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND Received: On time
ABRAHAM'S OASIS UK Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, SHADWELL Received: On time
JEAN MARGARET REED Trustee 08 July 2015 None on record
Samuel Ennis Trustee 05 July 2017 None on record
Michael Tadman Trustee 10 July 2019 None on record
Rev David John Ison Trustee 13 October 2021
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND Received: On time
ST PAUL'S CATHEDRAL CHOIR SCHOOL Received: On time
OZANNE FOUNDATION Received: On time
ST PANCRAS CHURCH LANDS TRUST Received: On time
THE ORDER OF THE BRITISH EMPIRE CHAPEL FUND Received: On time
ST PAUL'S CATHEDRAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
YODIA LO Trustee 05 July 2017 None on record
NIUL DILLON HATCHER Trustee 08 July 2015
Friends of Bethlehem UK Received: On time