WRVS BENEVOLENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make grants to persons who are or who have been a member, employee or volunteer of WVS, WRVS or Royal Voluntary Service, who being of limited means are in need of financial assistance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 December 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN BOYD | Chair | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Trevena Playle | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Green | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Stott | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DIGBY | Trustee | 25 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Gwen Deloux | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FALLON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.21k | £28.56k | £49.06k | £34.84k | £210.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.62k | £49.50k | £43.81k | £37.19k | £23.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16TH NOVEMBER 1970
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE TRUST AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN ANY SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR OWN ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR THE RELIEF COMFORT SUPPORT AND BENEFIT OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE AT ANY TIME BEEN MEMBERS OF THE ORGANISATION NOW KNOWN AS WOMEN'S ROYAL VOLUNTARY SERVICE EITHER IN GREAT BRITAIN OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD OF LIMITED MEANS WHO FOR ANY REASON BECOME IN NEED OF FINANCIAL OR SOME OTHER FORM OF HELP AND ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 769
Chesterfield
SN40 9NY
- Phone:
- 07
- Email:
- enquiry@wrvsbt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window