Financial history THE FOREIGN MISSIONARY FUND OF THE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY OF BRETHREN

Charity number: 261957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £135.01k £76.43k £261.69k £124.68k £116.51k
Total expenditure £95.06k £128.32k £144.22k £228.34k £230.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A