Financial history THE ABBEYFIELD CHALFONTS SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 261970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £163.23k £224.83k £226.07k £271.99k £275.14k
Total expenditure £230.10k £258.97k £240.18k £297.10k £300.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.96k £13.64k £10.10k N/A