THE ABBEYFIELD CHALFONTS SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 261970
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jasvinder Singh Sahota Trustee 21 May 2019 None on record
Peter John Fountain Trustee 01 May 2015 None on record
DAVID COOKNELL Trustee 14 October 2011
CHALFONTS AND GERRARDS CROSS HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS Charity reporting is up to date
Robert John Forster Chair 27 March 2018 None on record
Annette Paget Trustee 28 February 2020 None on record
Olwyn Jayne Pegler Trustee 31 October 2014 None on record