Financial history HAILSHAM AND DISTRICT MENCAP

Charity number: 261977
Charity reporting is overdue by 1817 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2011 30/09/2012 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015
Total gross income £0 £1.62k £711 £986 £515
Total expenditure £0 £9.02k £8.40k £7.03k £6.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A