INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE OF COMMUNICATIONS

Charity number: 261990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 19 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 19 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 10 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 10 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 18 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 22 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 22 October 2017 On time Download