Trustees THE CAMERON FUND
Charity number: 261993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GARY DENNIS CALVER | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr Brian McGregor | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Robert Nigel Barnett | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Richard Mark Vautrey | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Dr John Francis Kedward | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Durai Raj Jawahar | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Edward Gavin Crawford | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr PETER JOHN PASHLEY HOLDEN | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Dr SARAH FRANCES RANN | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Simon Parkinson | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr William Arnold McDowell | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Zoe Norris | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Vernon Harold Needham | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr William McAlpine | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Sean Phelan | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Terry John | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr CHARLES JOHN BRETT | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr ANDREW FRANCIS RODGETT | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr RICHARD BROWN | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr IAN STEWART WINTERTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.