THE CHRISTIAN CARE CENTRE
Charity Number: 262039
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To propagate the Protestant and Evangelical Faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2009
Total income: £224,473
Total expenditure: £212,345
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
- Newham
Governance
Registration history:
- 06 September 1971: Standard registration
- 06 August 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 06 August 2010: Funds transferred to 1128311 JUST HOMES CHARITY
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 30/06/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.55k | £90.54k | £91.98k | £115.73k | £224.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.04k | £85.16k | £94.22k | £112.78k | £212.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | 28 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | 11 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 01 May 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 03 April 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 25 April 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 21 March 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 28 April 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 24 November 2006 | 24 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 10 August 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 10 August 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH DECEMBER 1970
Charitable objects
TO PROPAGATE THE PROTESTANT AND EVANGELICAL FAITH.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window