Accounts and annual returns BLINDAID

Charity number: 262119
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 November 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 November 2020 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window