Trustees BLINDAID

Charity number: 262119
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angie Pankhania Chair 21 July 2021
None on record
Rachel Holdsworth Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Aneta Saunders Trustee 27 November 2019
None on record
Katia Ramo Trustee 08 June 2014
None on record
Mohammed Kassim Gaffar Trustee 27 November 2013
PRISONERS' ADVICE SERVICE
Received: On time
PAKISTAN ALLIANCE FOR GIRLS EDUCATION UK
Received: On time
Tim Barnard Trustee 10 October 2013
None on record
FRAN HIBBERT Trustee 10 October 2013
None on record