THE SIKH MISSIONARY SOCIETY (UK)

Charity number: 262404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 July 2020 176 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 July 2020 176 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 January 2017 On time Download