THE SIKH MISSIONARY SOCIETY (UK)

Charity number: 262404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £95.97k £96.75k £93.67k £107.65k £128.62k
Total expenditure £45.04k £68.74k £71.09k £69.05k £92.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A