THE ABBEYFIELD BERKHAMSTED AND HEMEL HEMPSTEAD SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 262424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 October 2017 On time Download