THE ABBEYFIELD BERKHAMSTED AND HEMEL HEMPSTEAD SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 262424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £773.78k £568.91k £582.00k £580.23k £586.50k
Total expenditure £836.38k £535.73k £575.47k £544.23k £533.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £3.79k
Income - Donations and legacies £10.37k £1.25k £2.38k £6.40k £5.51k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £758.80k £565.28k £576.70k £571.28k £578.42k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.61k £2.39k £2.93k £2.55k £2.57k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £500 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £836.38k £524.25k £558.88k £528.56k £518.17k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £14.32k £56.33k £71.86k £69.42k £67.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £11.48k £16.59k £15.68k £15.68k