THE ABBEYFIELD BERKHAMSTED AND HEMEL HEMPSTEAD SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 262424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Eaves Trustee 19 April 2021 None on record
JENNIFER RIDGWAY Trustee 31 January 2007 None on record
Deepinder Singh Chhabra Chair 14 August 2021 None on record
CHRISTINE JOYCE HOPCRAFT Trustee 01 August 1990 None on record
Ibironke Odegbami Trustee 01 May 2021 None on record
Karen Sheldon Trustee 13 May 2014 None on record