ENFIELD AND CHESHUNT LEAGUE OF HOSPITAL FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of medical equipment and improvement of patient care within hospitals in Enfield and Cheshunt.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Enfield
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 08 June 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michele Christine Smith | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MALVERN FREDERICK HARE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.22k | £466 | £18 | £1.02k | £4.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £44.97k | £59.49k | £6.25k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 28TH APRIL 1971
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE CHACE SUB-GROUP OF HOSPITALS WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITALS. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE ENFIELD AND CHESHUNT
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Champions Way
HODDESDON
Hertfordshire
EN11 9NG
- Phone:
- 07813 958286
- Email:
- fred.hare@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window