AGE CONCERN BLETCHINGLEY

Charity number: 262559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £1.79k £1.88k £2.23k £2.27k £2.63k
Total expenditure £1.73k £1.68k £1.88k £1.20k £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A