HULLBRIDGE SENIOR CITIZENS WELFARE COUNCIL

Charity number: 262616
Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 182 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required