HULLBRIDGE SENIOR CITIZENS WELFARE COUNCIL

Charity number: 262616
Charity reporting is overdue by 178 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £18.03k £13.70k £17.71k £18.99k £25.77k
Total expenditure £17.66k £14.33k £16.15k £17.31k £21.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A