Accounts and annual returns THE JERUSALEM ACADEMY TRUST

Charity number: 262716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 February 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window