BRITISH CONNEMARA PONY SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 262765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £56.51k £39.79k £43.44k £55.49k £52.47k
Total expenditure £51.10k £44.01k £41.60k £49.12k £48.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A