BRITISH CONNEMARA PONY SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 262765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mrs K Walters Trustee 26 November 2017 None on record
Julia Woods Trustee 01 December 2019 None on record
Susan Mary Gillingham Trustee 01 December 2019 None on record
Sarah Crundall Rook Trustee 21 November 2021 None on record
Anne Marjorie Harries ,The Hon. Trustee 01 December 2019 None on record
Barbara Kay Gibb Trustee 21 November 2021 None on record
Lauren Stokeld Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Katy Louise Seedhouse Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Anne Ward Trustee 02 December 2018 None on record
Kerry Wainwright Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Cherry Caddy Trustee 01 December 2019 None on record
John Steven Strang Trustee 21 November 2021 None on record