THE DOVE-BOWERMAN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 September 1971: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2006 | 05/04/2007 | 05/04/2008 | 05/04/2009 | 05/04/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.69k | £69.09k | £73.30k | £75.48k | £56.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.67k | £64.22k | £70.05k | £76.48k | £60.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | 06 September 2011 | 213 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | 06 September 2011 | 213 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | 14 May 2010 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | 14 May 2010 | 98 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 20 April 2009 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | 20 April 2009 | 74 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH JUNE 1971
Charitable objects
TO OR TOWARDS OR IN FURTHERANCE OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE EDUCATIONAL CHARITIES EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE COMPANIES OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE BODIES OR ORGANISATIONS OR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL SELECT AND THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window