Accounts and annual returns SOCIAL WORKERS BENEVOLENT TRUST

Charity number: 262889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 03 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 03 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 06 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 06 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 21 August 2020 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 21 August 2020 22 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 11 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 02 December 2019 125 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 04 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 23 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window