Trustees SOCIAL WORKERS BENEVOLENT TRUST
Charity number: 262889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS SU ROXBURGH | Chair | 22 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Susanne Smith | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Kirsty Leigh Hancock | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mama Addo-Yobo | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Mike Young | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jaison Musindo | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Pook | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Scott | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|||||||
Liz Williams | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||
RUPERT FRANKLIN | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET FAULKNER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.