Accounts and annual returns HENRY ROGERS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 262927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 17 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 August 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 19 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required