FLAX BOURTON COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity Number: 262940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Financial relief to the poor and needy in the parish of Flax Bourton

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,772
Total expenditure: £630

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • North Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 September 1971: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHARITY FOR A POOR HOUSE (Previous name)
  • FLAX BOURTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Danes Falconer Trustee 16 October 2024
None on record
Adrienne Hughes Trustee 16 October 2024
None on record
ANNA LOUISE BARR Trustee 19 August 2024
None on record
HELEN HARRIS Trustee
None on record
JANE ALICIA MOSS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.73k £1.40k £1.56k £1.73k £1.77k
Total expenditure £2.27k £300 £1.82k £2.76k £630
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
22 PARSONS MEAD
FLAX BOURTON
BRISTOL
BS48 1UH
Phone:
01275461209
Website:

No information available