Financial history NORWICH ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 262968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £9.90k £9.77k £8.72k £17.69k £21.31k
Total expenditure £8.26k £11.04k £10.19k £8.67k £20.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £17.95k